THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:36:26 PM
Chomienne, Marie-Helene
CPSO#:
74363
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Oct 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Oct 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Chomienne-Abboud, Marie-Helene (used until: 17 May 2007 )
Abboud, Marie-Helene (used until: 24 Oct 2001 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Pierre Et Marie Curie University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 6093
Fax: (613) 748-4953
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M-H Chomienne Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE CHOMIENNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOMIENNE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1999 |