THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:04:40 PM
Shearing, Anthony Denning
CPSO#:
74281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4400 Ext. 3121
Fax: (705) 645-1225
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Sep 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY DENNING SHEARING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEARING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 12 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2000 to 07 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2001 |