THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:51:09 AM
Krishnan, Murali
CPSO#:
74248
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Nagpur University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
15 Gallie Court
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-1962
Fax: (705) 728-9455
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MURALI KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2004 to 18 Jul 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |