THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:46:43 AM
Khan, Abdul Aleem
CPSO#:
74225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1535 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8X 2G3
Phone: 5159155565
Fax: 5199155515
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Jun 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 11 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2016 |
|
Active |