THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:55:22 PM
Siu, King Fun
CPSO#:
74220
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bay-College Medical Clinic
Unit 216C
777 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C8
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. F. Siu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KING FUN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 02 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2001 |