THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 7:14:56 AM
Selaman, Mustafa Hashim
CPSO#:
74208
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Turkish
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
43 Bruyère St
elizabeth bruyere hospital
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: 6135626262
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUSTAFA HASHIM SELAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELAMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 27 Aug 2002
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2015 |