THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:58:54 AM
Denton, Omotayo
CPSO#:
74207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Denton, Patricia Helen Omotayo (used until: 27 Jul 2000 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7B Pleasant Boulevard
Suite 1025
Toronto ON M4T 1K2
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Denton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMOTAYO DENTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2000 |