THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:50:31 PM
Levy, Deborah Merrill
CPSO#:
74185
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228108
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH MERRILL LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2009 |