THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:42:43 AM
El Hajj, May Ibrahim
CPSO#:
74153
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: American University of Beirut, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110-150 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: 519-215-0227
Fax: 1-855-554-0961
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:17 Oct 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAY IBRAHIM EL HAJJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL HAJJ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
McMaster University, 20 Sep 2002 to 18 Oct 2002
PEAP - R - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Oct 2002 to 17 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2005 |