THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:48:27 PM
Ergaiey, Houda Ali
CPSO#:
74124
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
207-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Phone: 5197459889
Fax: 5197456446
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:09 Nov 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOUDA ALI ERGAIEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERGAIEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 18 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 18 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2003 to 07 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2004 |