THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:05:53 AM
Parshuram, Christopher Sushil
CPSO#:
74049
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Otago, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Critical Care Medicine Program
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-4919
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |
|
Active |