THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:45:47 PM
Jun, Martin Chun
CPSO#:
74039
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 11210
Fax: (905) 428-8277
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN CHUN JUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2005 |