THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:18:12 AM
Landolt-Marticorena, Carolina Maria
CPSO#:
74006
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Oct 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Landolt Marticorena, Carolina (used until: 04 Oct 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
148 Manitou Dr
Kitchener ON N2C 1L3
Phone: 2264991001
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Runnymede Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:29 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINA MARIA LANDOLT-MARTICORENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDOLT-MARTICORENA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2004 |