THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:38:49 PM
Levy, Michelle
CPSO#:
74003
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Glied, Michelle (used until: 31 Oct 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michelle Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 22 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For assistance in obtaining their records, patients can contact [email protected]
Date Received: 29 Mar 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2022 |