THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:51:18 PM
Ho, Angela Luoh-Hua
CPSO#:
74000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
H1 Department of Diagnostic Imaging
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6073
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELA LUOH-HUA HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2004 |