THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:03:59 AM
Theal, Jeremy John Thomas
CPSO#:
73982
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Theal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:21 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |