THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:03:35 PM
O'Hayon, Bonnie Bracha Esther
CPSO#:
73975
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Nov 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
1NE 732
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. x6186
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BONNIE BRACHA ESTHER O'HAYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'HAYON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 04 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 05 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2005 |