THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:44:29 PM
Ponesse, Jonathan Stephen
CPSO#:
73951
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite WW2204
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L2
Phone: 613-737-0871 Ext. 4327
Fax: 613-523-5167
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jonathan Ponesse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN STEPHEN PONESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONESSE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2007 |