THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:35:11 PM
Vlaovic, Peter David
CPSO#:
73908
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, Serbian
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 305 K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 465-6008
Fax: (416) 465-3901
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:31 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER DAVID VLAOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |