THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:57:32 AM
Grober, Ethan Daniel
CPSO#:
73894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 May 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Murray Koffler Urologic Wellness
Centre 6th Floor Box 19
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5374
Fax: (416) 586-4823
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ETHAN DANIEL GROBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROBER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2007 |