THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:26:02 AM
Chan, John Chi Cheong
CPSO#:
73893
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
13311 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4E 3L6
Phone: (905) 773-2362
Fax: (905) 773-8499
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Apr 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN CHI CHEONG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Jul 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)