THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:11:53 AM
Moozar, Kouros
CPSO#:
73855
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Latifpour Moozar, Kouros (used until: 17 Nov 2004 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-4994
Fax: (905) 721-6623
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KOUROS MOOZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOZAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2006 |