THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:02:27 AM
Bernardini, Marcus Quirino
CPSO#:
73845
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital/UHN
Dept of Gynecology Oncology
700 University Avenue Suite 6-812
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4043
Fax: (416) 946-2288
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCUS QUIRINO BERNARDINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARDINI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |