THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:18:57 AM
Gandhi, Jasmine
CPSO#:
73828
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 May 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 May 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
4th Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 Apr 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASMINE GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2005 |