THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:48:11 PM
Punjani, Yasmeen Ali Bhai
CPSO#:
73812
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8111
Fax: (416) 289-2961
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMEEN ALI BHAI PUNJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNJANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2003 |