THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:30:57 AM
Mahoney, Brian Andrew
CPSO#:
73787
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington
County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: (613) 354-7157
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN ANDREW MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2007 |