THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:17:20 AM
Williams, Brent Allen
CPSO#:
73778
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRENT ALLEN WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2005 |