THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:41:02 AM
Steele, Stephen Scott
CPSO#:
73771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6090
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:11 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN SCOTT STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2005 |