THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:58:13 AM
Malik, Arinder Kaur
CPSO#:
73716
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Punjab University India, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12 suite 100A
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7N 3N2
Phone: (289) 337-2716
Fax: (289) 337-8396
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARINDER KAUR MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neonatal Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
CF - Neonatal Cardiology
McMaster University, 27 Oct 2003 to 26 Apr 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Jun 2009 |