THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:30:49 AM
Haddad, Michel
CPSO#:
73689
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of ICU
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 4534
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |