THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:17:16 PM
Bailliu, Leslie Anne
CPSO#:
73688
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
81S11-60 Moodie Dr
Nepean ON K1A 0K6
Phone: 6139952534
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L.A. Bailliu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2009
Corporation Name: L.A. Bailliu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLIE ANNE BAILLIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILLIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 15 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Care of the Elderly)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2002 |