THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:05:24 AM
Goldberg, Cory Scot
CPSO#:
73687
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 401
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 907-5810
Fax: (647) 477-6284
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CORY SCOT GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2006 |