THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:47:40 PM
Campbell, Robert James
CPSO#:
73664
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Nov 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Nov 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
166 Brock St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Ophthalmology
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3310 Ext. 3189
Fax: 613-533-6667
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2004 |