THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:11:10 AM
Bond, Rebecca Mary
CPSO#:
73631
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West Elgin Community Health Centre
153 Main Street
West Lorne ON N0L 2P0
Phone: 519 768 1715
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rebecca Bond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA MARY BOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2001 |