THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:11:07 PM
Taylor, Valerie Hannah
CPSO#:
73630
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Valerie Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Women's College Hospital, 76 Grenville Street, Toronto, Ontario M5S 1B2
Date Received: 04 Feb 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2020 |