THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:23:04 AM
Amjadi, Kayvan
CPSO#:
73618
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian, Urdu
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 211
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79679
Fax: (613) 739-6993
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:14 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAYVAN AMJADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |