THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:25:19 AM
Eisen, Jeffrey Stephen
CPSO#:
73616
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Eisen Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |