THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 4:04:41 AM
Narayan, Shanil Vinode
CPSO#:
73606
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
St Mary's Memorial Hospital |
St Marys |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Oct 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANIL VINODE NARAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 21 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2004 |