THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:48:05 AM
Patel, Ketan N
CPSO#:
73599
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Gujarati
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ketan Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
8 - 627 Maitland St
London ON N5Y 2V7
Date Received: 15 Jan 2019
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request
Suite 101B
111 Waterloo Street
London ON N6B 2M4
Date Received: 12 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2016 |