THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:32:58 AM
Chiasson, Paul Jeffrey
CPSO#:
73595
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 742-6200
Fax: (519) 742-9920
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chiasson Sues-McKay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:23 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY CHIASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIASSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2001 |