THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:50:39 PM
Chan, Adrien
CPSO#:
73588
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-7200
Fax: (807) 684-5806
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Emo |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2019 |