THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:11:04 AM
Causey, Shannon Elizabeth
CPSO#:
73585
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057289090 Ext. 46550
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Shannon Causey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Canada
111 St. Regis Cres S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-888-398-5935
www,rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 May 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH CAUSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUSEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2019 |