THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:08:20 PM
Radan, Aleksandar
CPSO#:
73584
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 May 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Alexandria Marine & General Hospita
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-8522
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jan 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR RADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2007 |