THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:49:52 AM
White, Christine Anne
CPSO#:
73580
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Mar 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Etherington Hall Queens University
3032
Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 533-3134
Fax: (613) 533-3292
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site |
Moosonee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:14 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2002 to 23 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 23 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2005 |