THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:44:29 AM
Cooper, Curtis Lindsay
CPSO#:
73576
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room-G12
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 72296
Fax: (613) 737-8164
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:09 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CURTIS LINDSAY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1999 |