THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:26:26 AM
Syed, Khalid Ali
CPSO#:
73567
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
E W 1 446
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5281
Fax: 8883779331
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALID ALI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |