THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:02:28 PM
Taylor, Brian Vance
CPSO#:
73565
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Road to Recovery - Barrie
Unit 3
7 Anne Street South
Barrie ON L4N 2C4
Phone: (705) 719-7333
Fax: (705) 719-0832
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN VANCE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2020 |