THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:23:43 AM
Caron, Sharine Colleen
CPSO#:
73556
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100-701 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1A2
Phone: 2897687246
Fax: 2897792273
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bentley & Dr. Caron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 12 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARINE COLLEEN CARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2001 |