THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:52:00 AM
Lajoie, Lucie
CPSO#:
73554
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
23 Kenyon St East
PO Box 1630
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital |
Alexandria |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUCIE LAJOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJOIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 05 Feb 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 07 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2002 |