THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:11:30 AM
Green, Jerome Andrew
CPSO#:
73544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
218-16700 Bayview Ave
Newmarket ON L3X 1W1
Phone: 9058365561
Fax: 9058537057
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEROME ANDREW GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |